NH HB1418 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 29; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 29; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the minutes of nonpublic sessions of public bodies.
Title
Relative to the minutes of nonpublic sessions of public bodies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 29; Eff. 1/1/2017 |
2016-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 25 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/07/2016); Senate Journal 13 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2016; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/23/2016, Rooms 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 44 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 26 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 13 |