NH HB1416 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certification for the microblading of eyebrows.
Title
Authorizing certification for the microblading of eyebrows.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 13 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 21 |