NH HB1415 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - House Signed By Governor 06/11/2012; Effective 06/11/2012; Chapter 0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - House Signed By Governor 06/11/2012; Effective 06/11/2012; Chapter 0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permits for repair or replacement of sewage and waste disposal system.
Title
Relative to permits for repair or replacement of sewage and waste disposal system.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | House Signed By Governor 06/11/2012; Effective 06/11/2012; Chapter 0174 | |
2012-06-05 | Senate Enrolled (05/23/12) | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled; House Journal 47, PG.2508 | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2344e Adopted; House Journal 47, PG.2507 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2344e Adopted | |
2012-05-15 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1651s (Rep Renzullo): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2280 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1651s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.416 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Committee Amendment 1651s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.386 | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1651s, 4/25/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Hearing: 4/12/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7, Pg.186 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0934h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1318 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0934h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1318-1319 | |
2012-02-22 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0934h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.992-993 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0934h(NT) for Mar 7 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1074-1075 | |
2012-02-08 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/21/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-02-02 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-01-26 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-01-18 | House Executive Session: 1/31/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-01-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-01-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/24/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-12-27 | House Public Hearing: 1/10/2012 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 7, PG.354 |