NH HB1410 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0238; Effective Date 7/21/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0238; Effective Date 7/21/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Including household and domesticated animals under the domestic violence protection statute.
Title
Including household and domesticated animals under the domestic violence protection statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 231 N: 90 NV: 32 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 231 N: 90 NV: 46 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 231 N: 90 NV: 46 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0238; Effective Date 7/21/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1913c; Adopted, Regular Calendar 231-90 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1913c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1913c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Boutin, and Soucy; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Shurtleff, Wallner, Chandler, Nordgren |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1732s, 1840s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2014-1840s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1732s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Remove From Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1732s, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 4/29/14, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Reconsider (Rep. William O'Brien) Motion Failed Div 130-200 |
2014-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |