NH HB1406 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities to collect compost.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to collect compost.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Egan [D] | Rep. Eric Gallager [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] |
Rep. Joyce Weston [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |