NH HB1402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98369392540 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98369392540 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing procedures for municipal host customer-generators of electrical energy.
Title
Establishing procedures for municipal host customer-generators of electrical energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - Interim Study (Y: 188 N: 148 NV: 36 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98369392540 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-02-19 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-148 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 77 |
2020-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0593h |
2020-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 25 |
2020-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 21 |