NH HB140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study the licensing of drivers from foreign countries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the licensing of drivers from foreign countries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-03HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1438s (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1438s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1438s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateSen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 140 from the Consent Calendar; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0687h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0687h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0687h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback