NH HB140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 123; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 123; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the licensing of drivers from foreign countries.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the licensing of drivers from foreign countries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 123; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1438s (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1438s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1438s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 140 from the Consent Calendar; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0687h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0687h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0687h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 39 |