NH HB1398 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 198; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 198; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of centralized criminal history records checks in education.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of centralized criminal history records checks in education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 198; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1545s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1545s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved Reconsideration on the following action taken by this Body on HB 1398. Reconsider the vote on third reading and final passage. Rescind third reading. Reconsider the vote on Ought to Pass. Reconsider the vote on Committee Amendment #2022-1545s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1545s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to Reconsider the vote on: Committee Amendment #2022-1545, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1545s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Ward Moved to Remove HB 1398 from the Consent Calendar; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1545s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building205-207 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building205-207 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |