NH HB1393 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the election of Grafton county commissioners.
Title
Relative to the election of Grafton county commissioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0246h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 18 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0246h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 18 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0246h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 13 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 20 |