NH HB1392 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedure for filing federal tax liens.
Title
Relative to the procedure for filing federal tax liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 18 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 12 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 20 |