NH HB1390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 197; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 197; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to language translation services in telemedicine.
Title
Relative to access to language translation services in telemedicine.
Sponsors
Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Manny Espitia [D] | Rep. Joshua Query [D] | Rep. Safiya Wazir [D] |
Rep. Gaby Grossman [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 197; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1130s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1130s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1130s, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0409h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0409h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0409h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |