NH HB1389 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: Jan 28 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 303
Hearing: Jan 30 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 303
Hearing: Feb 4 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to criminal penalties for not providing adequate food, water, and shelter for animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to criminal penalties for not providing adequate food, water, and shelter for animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-21HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-21House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-10House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback