NH HB1387 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-157 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-157 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the declawing of cats.
Title
Prohibiting the declawing of cats.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Sherry Dutzy [D] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-157 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 45 |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 19 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 20 |