NH HB1382 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1150

Summary

Relative to workforce housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to workforce housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-03 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1150
2010-02-18 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for March 3 Consent Calendar (vote 14-1); House Calendar 17, PG.809
2010-02-09 House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 (Continued 2/18/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 If Necessary)
2010-01-06 House Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2009-12-10 House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 6, PG.238

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback