NH HB138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing prisoners serving life sentences to be eligible for parole after 25 years.
Title
Allowing prisoners serving life sentences to be eligible for parole after 25 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 67 |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96477061090 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 36 |