NH HB1377 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 297; I. Sec. 1 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 297; I. Sec. 1 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to emancipation by marriage and establishing a committee to study the emancipation of minors.
Title
Relative to emancipation by marriage and establishing a committee to study the emancipation of minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 297; I. Sec. 1 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 6/25/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1997c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1997c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-1997c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Lasky; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. K. Rice, Itse, Lewicke, Walz 05/10/2018 House Journal 17 P. 2 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1404s and Requests CofC (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 House Journal 17 P. 2 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1404s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1404s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1404s, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0728h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 5 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0728h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 5 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0728h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-31 | House | ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-24 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 8 |