NH HB1374 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voluntarily surrendered firearms.
Title
Relative to voluntarily surrendered firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - OTP (Y: 181 N: 141 NV: 32 Abs: 42) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-141 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 150 |
2020-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 42 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary) |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/25/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 19 |