NH HB1372 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for teacher certification.
Title
Relative to requirements for teacher certification.
Sponsors
Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Fred Doucette [R] |
Rep. Melissa Litchfield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |