NH HB1372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 245; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the implanting of subcutaneous identification devices in individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the implanting of subcutaneous identification devices in individuals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 245; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1734s (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1734s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1734s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1734s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-10SenateHearing: 04/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0453h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 21
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0453h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 21
2018-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0453h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 11
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback