NH HB1370 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 187-153 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 187-153 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study childcare options for New Hampshire state legislators.
Title
Establishing a committee to study childcare options for New Hampshire state legislators.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] |
Rep. Amanda Toll [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 187-153 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 2:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Legislative Administration |