NH HB1364 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 212-121 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 212-121 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payments to the public utilities commission in lieu of meeting renewable portfolio standards for biomass.
Title
Relative to payments to the public utilities commission in lieu of meeting renewable portfolio standards for biomass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 212-121 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 70 |
2020-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 25 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 19 |