NH HB1363 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the enforceability of noncompete agreements in areas in which there is determined to be a critical shortage of workers.
Title
Relative to the enforceability of noncompete agreements in areas in which there is determined to be a critical shortage of workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2022 11:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-02-10 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/10/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |