NH HB1358 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-63 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-63 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the identification of lobbyists.
Title
Relative to the identification of lobbyists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 221 N: 63 NV: 67 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-63 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 163 |
2020-03-12 | House | Special Order (Rep. T. Smith): Motion Failed DV 101-194 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 145 |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 66 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 19 |