NH HB1356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 296; I. Sec. 1 eff. 8/24/2018; II. Rem. eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 296; I. Sec. 1 eff. 8/24/2018; II. Rem. eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to data sharing between the department of environmental services and the department of health and human services; making an appropriation to the department of business and economic affairs for relocation costs; and relative to the exemption for recreational vehicles from property taxation.
Title
Relative to data sharing between the department of environmental services and the department of health and human services; making an appropriation to the department of business and economic affairs for relocation costs; and relative to the exemption for recreational vehicles from property taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. James McConnell [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 296; I. Sec. 1 eff. 8/24/2018; II. Rem. eff. 6/25/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2105e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2105e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2038c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2038c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2038c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-05-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Spanos Replaces Rep. J. Belanger 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Bradley, D'Allesandro; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sytek, Schuett, L. Ober, J. Belanger 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1465s and 1869s and Requests CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1869s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment # 2018-1869s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1465s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1465s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1465s, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-1291s; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0374h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 9 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0374h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 9 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0374h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8 |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 8 |