NH HB1354 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the wearing of a mask while participating in a public demonstration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the wearing of a mask while participating in a public demonstration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020
2020-02-03HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 4
2020-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback