NH HB1353 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study equal access and opportunity for students with disabilities to participate in athletics.
Title
Establishing a commission to study equal access and opportunity for students with disabilities to participate in athletics.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-08-28 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/04/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-08-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-02-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 7 |