NH HB135 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB135

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the submission of evidence prior to hearings in divorce cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the submission of evidence prior to hearings in divorce cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-26SenateSpecial Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-29SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2509h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 26
2018-01-03HouseAmendment # 2017-2509h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 26
2017-11-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2509h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-10-25HouseExecutive Session: 11/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-09-19HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-06-07HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-05-09HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-04-26HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-03-01HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-02-08HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-09HouseVacated to Children and Family Law Without Objection 01/04/2017 House Journal 2 P. 15
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 18

Same As/Similar To

HB135 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2509h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback