NH HB135 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-06 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.263
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-06 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.263
Summary
Relative to remedies for violation of the state right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to remedies for violation of the state right-to-know law.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. William O'Brien [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Robert Rowe [R] |
Rep. James Splaine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.263 | |
2009-11-20 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 Consent Calendar (vote 18-0); House Calendar 2, PG.83 | |
2009-10-21 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/17/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2009-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2009-08-06 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2009-03-17 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-10 | House Executive Session: 3/17/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 (Contined 3/18&19/09 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 If Needed) | |
2009-02-23 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2009 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2009-01-07 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2009 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2009-01-07 | House Introduced 1/7/2009 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 8, PG. 122 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=458&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |