NH HB1346 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 32; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2018; II. Rem. eff. 5/15/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study the New Hampshire veterans cemetery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the New Hampshire veterans cemetery.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 32; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2018; II. Rem. eff. 5/15/2018
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled 04/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1108s (Rep. R. Ober): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2
2018-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1108s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1108s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1108s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13
2018-02-28SenateHearing: 03/14/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0115h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 14
2018-02-08HouseAmendment # 2018-0115h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 14
2018-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0115h (NT) for 02/07/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 16
2018-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-10House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/17/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback