NH HB1346 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 08/17/2012; Chapter 0258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 08/17/2012; Chapter 0258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the construction of power line extensions.
Title
Relative to the construction of power line extensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 08/17/2012; Chapter 0258 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2613 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2442c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2598 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2442c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-31 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2012-2442c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2012-05-25 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/30/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Odell, Gallus, and Merrill | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Odell Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-17 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps J.Garrity, Holden, Cataldo, and Rappaport; House Journal 46, PG.2493 | |
2012-05-17 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1966s and Request C of C (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2493 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1966s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.506 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Committee Amendment 1966s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.484 | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1966s, 5/9/12; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Hearing: 4/26/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9, Pg.333 | |
2012-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1617 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 7 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1138 | |
2012-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 2/7/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:15:AM)== | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 7, PG.352 |