NH HB1343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0301; Effective Date 9/30/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0301; Effective Date 9/30/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to guardian ad litem fees.
Title
Relative to guardian ad litem fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | House | Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0301; Effective Date 9/30/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1911c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1911c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1911c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Boutin, and Soucy; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Shurtleff, Wallner, Chandler, Nordgren |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Weber moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1750s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1750s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1750s, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 5/6/14, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0722h (NT) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0722h (NT) Amendment Adopted Div 316-15 |
2014-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0722h (New Title) |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0722h (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Children and Family Law |