NH HB1343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-123; House Journal 26, PG.1370-1372
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-123; House Journal 26, PG.1370-1372
Summary
Establishing a joint committee on the constitutionality of acts, orders, laws, statutes, regulations, and rules of the government of the United States of America in order to protect state sovereignty.
Title
Establishing a joint committee on the constitutionality of acts, orders, laws, statutes, regulations, and rules of the government of the United States of America in order to protect state sovereignty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-123; House Journal 26, PG.1370-1372 | |
2010-03-11 | House Special Order to Beginning of Mar 17 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.1349 | |
2010-03-10 | House Special Order to Regular Place on Mar 11 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 23, PG.1294 | |
2010-02-18 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 19, PG.1037 | |
2010-02-18 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 10 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1037 | |
2010-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2010-02-03 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-01-19 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.236 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2280&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |