NH HB1342 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of certain information to underwrite insurance.
Title
Prohibiting the use of certain information to underwrite insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. William Hatch [D] | Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 76 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 80 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 11 |