NH HB1341 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Remove from Table (Rep. Proulx): Motion Failed DV 125-218 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to vested status of group II members in the state retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to vested status of group II members in the state retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Proulx): Motion Failed DV 125-218 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 77
2020-02-19HouseLay on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 182-161 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 50
2020-02-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-02-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0137h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 20
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2020-01-09House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback