NH HB134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2407h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2407h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to causes for divorce.
Title
Relative to causes for divorce.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2407h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-09-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-06-07 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-04-26 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-09 | House | Vacated to Children and Family Law Without Objection 01/04/2017 House Journal 2 P. 15 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB134 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2407h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)