NH HB1336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rulemaking by the state board of education concerning violations of the professional code of ethics and the professional code of conduct.
Title
Relative to rulemaking by the state board of education concerning violations of the professional code of ethics and the professional code of conduct.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |