NH HB1331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organ donation on a driver's license.
Title
Relative to organ donation on a driver's license.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] |
Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0471h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 32 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0471h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 32 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0471h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 19 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 18 |