NH HB1327 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 243; Eff. 6/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to apprentice electricians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to apprentice electricians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Committee Amendment 1780s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 243; Eff. 6/12/2018
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1780s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1780s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Kahn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1780s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1780s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-12SenateHearing: 04/18/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0853h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 34
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0853h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 34
2018-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0853h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 19
2018-03-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-13House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-06House==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-05House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/09/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2633&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1327
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1646&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1646
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1646
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=206&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1327&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1327&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2633
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=207&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1327&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1327&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2633

Bill Comments

feedback