NH HB1325 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to release of confidential records of a person appointed a guardian.
Title
Relative to release of confidential records of a person appointed a guardian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/14/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2022-0230h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0230h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0230h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 01/13/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |