NH HB1309 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 185-105 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the effect of warrant articles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the effect of warrant articles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 185-105 03/12/2020
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 68
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2020-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/18/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback