NH HB1303 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to causes for absolute divorce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to causes for absolute divorce.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022
2022-05-17SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13
2022-05-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
2022-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2022-04-20SenateHearing: 04/26/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2022-03-01SenateIntroduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5
2022-02-16HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3
2022-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2022-01-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar)
2022-01-19HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2021-11-19HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback