NH HB1303 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 225; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2017 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/9/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 225; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2017 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/9/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study issues relating to pre-existing districts withdrawing from a cooperative school district.
Title
Establishing a commission to study issues relating to pre-existing districts withdrawing from a cooperative school district.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Rep. James Devine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 225; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2017 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/9/2016 |
2016-06-02 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 56 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1995e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 28 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1995e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1296s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1296s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1296s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2016 Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1296s, 04/14/2016; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0683h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 18 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0683h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 18 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0683h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/12/2016 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/11/2016 01:40 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 9 |