NH HB1299 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to group II membership in the retirement system for certain firefighter educators.
Title
Relative to group II membership in the retirement system for certain firefighter educators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 5 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 15 |