NH HB1298 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for the education tax credit.
Title
Relative to eligibility for the education tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - OTP (Y: 159 N: 152 NV: 39 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-21 | House | Reconsider HB1298 (Rep. Luneau): Motion Failed DV 152-162 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 159-152 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |