NH HB1295 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to persons held in civil contempt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to persons held in civil contempt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 290 N: 41 NV: 24 Abs: 37) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-26SenateSpecial Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-04-03SenateHearing: 04/09/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-28SenateIntroduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-21HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0627h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 290-41 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 8
2018-03-21HouseAmendment # 2018-0627h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 8
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0627h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 70
2018-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 6

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback