NH HB1288 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to petitions for annulment.
Title
Relative to petitions for annulment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0493h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 17 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0493h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 17 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0493h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 14 |
2018-02-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-02-07 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 5 |