NH HB1286 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the modification of parental rights and responsibilities.
Title
Relative to the modification of parental rights and responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 0900am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |