NH HB1286 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the licensure and regulation of music therapists.
Title
Relative to the licensure and regulation of music therapists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 182 N: 125 NV: 42 Abs: 47) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0927h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-125 03/12/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0927h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0927h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 55 |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/03/2020 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/25/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 16 |