NH HB1286 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 135; Eff. 7/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 135; Eff. 7/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to days when fishing without a license is permitted.
Title
Relative to days when fishing without a license is permitted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 135; Eff. 7/26/2016 |
2016-05-18 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 128 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/12/2016); Senate Journal 18 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 34 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 20 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building304 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 4 P. 9 |